judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHEN PALMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0252)
Case Number:S-08-0252Case Docketed On:11/24/2008
Linked To: S-08-0215 , S-09-0002
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEPHEN PALMER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEPHEN PALMER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen PalmerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 129
Citation:218 P.3d 941

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/24/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Correction from Court Reporter re Jury Trial PageNotice-IncomingCorrectionFinal
01/09/2009Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
01/09/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/21/2009Order - Granting stay - Time Limitied Stay of Briefing ScheduleOrderGranting stayFinal
03/23/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/01/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/19/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/20/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers (two red folders); Volume II, Transcripts (three).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
10/22/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/12/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/10/09 in Case S-08-0252.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal