judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FILLEY ENTERPRISES, INC. v. YOUNGSTOWN SHEET AND TUBE COMPANY

Case: B-1339
B-1339
01/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
FILLEY ENTERPRISES, INC.
YOUNGSTOWN SHEET AND TUBE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/30/1969Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/24/1969Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/20/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/03/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/21/1969Opinion issued
04/30/1969Response to Brief filed
04/24/1969Supplemental Brief filed
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/20/1969Reply to Response
02/03/1969Response to Petition
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Filley Enterprises, Inc.Petitioner
Youngstown Sheet and Tube CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information