judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 11-94-00043-CR
11-94-00043-CR
04/08/1994
Probation Revocation
Gobert, Milton Dwayne
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/31/1994Yearly opinion book
10/07/1994Mandate issued
10/06/1994Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/30/1994Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed
07/28/1994Brief filed
07/28/1994Case ready to be set
06/23/1994Mot. - Ext. to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1994Mot. - Ext. to file brief
06/03/1994Brief filed
05/03/1994Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1994Judgment of trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/07/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKollin Shadle
James Hicks, District Attorney
Gobert, Milton DwayneCriminal - AppellantStuart Holden
Trial Court Information
104th District Court
Taylor
Honorable Billy John Edwards, Senior Judge
10,671-B
10 Years