judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0374-94
PD-0374-94
04/08/1994
PDR Case Type
RANKIN, RANDALL ALLEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/07/1994BRIEF FILEDState
07/28/1994BRIEF FILEDAppellant
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
09/18/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
09/18/1998MANDATE ISSD
09/16/1998REHEAR DISPDENIED
09/16/1998REHEAR DISPDENIED
07/23/1998REHEAR FILED GPDR
07/23/1998REHEAR FILED
07/08/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the disposition of a processVacated COA; Remanded COA
07/08/1998OPINION ISSDVacated COA; Remanded COA
07/08/1998OPINION ISSD/2Vacated COA; Remanded COA
07/08/1998OPINION ISSD/2Vacated COA; Remanded COA
01/14/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
01/14/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
01/14/1998SUBMITTED REH/2
12/03/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
12/03/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
12/03/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/03/1997REHEAR GRANTED GPDR
12/03/1997REHEAR DISPGranted
12/03/1997REHEAR DISPGranted
12/03/1997REHEAR DISPGranted
12/03/1997REHEAR DISPGranted
12/03/1997SET FOR SUB REH
04/29/1996REHEAR FILED GPDR
04/29/1996REHEAR FILED
04/25/1996REHEAR FILED GPDR
04/25/1996REHEAR FILED
04/10/1996OPINION ISSDVacated COA; Remanded COA
04/10/1996OPINION ISSDVacated COA; Remanded COA
04/10/1996OPINION ISSDVacated COA; Remanded COA
10/19/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
10/19/1994SUBMITTED
09/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
09/09/1994SET FOR SUBMIS
09/07/1994BRIEF FILED
09/06/1994NO BRIEF FILED
08/31/1994EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
08/31/1994EXT BRIEF FILED
07/28/1994BRIEF FILED
07/15/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR GRANTED
06/29/1994PDR DISPGranted
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPGranted
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILED
04/12/1994PDR FILED
04/12/1994PDR FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/1998STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRobert A. Huttash
John B. Holmes
Rankin, Randall AllenApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mary Catherine Clarkson
Court of Appeals Information:
14-92-00806-CR
AFF 1-20-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable BOB BURDETTE
602056