judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0370-94
PD-0370-94
04/08/1994
PDR Case Type
LEWIS, HENRY, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/10/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJaime Esparza
LEWIS, HENRYJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Norbert J Garney
Court of Appeals Information:
08-93-00009-CR
REV & REM 2-23-94
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
Honorable GUADALUPE RIVERA
58737