judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0371-94
PD-0371-94
04/08/1994
PDR Case Type
SHELLEY, CEDRIC D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/05/1994FINAL DISPRefused
08/02/1994REHEAR RECEIVED
08/02/1994REHEAR REJECTED
07/01/1994REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
07/01/1994REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/09/1994MOTION DISPDENIED
06/09/1994MOTION FILED
05/13/1994RESPONSE FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
04/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
SHELLEY, CEDRIC D.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Gerald Fry
Court of Appeals Information:
14-92-01357-CR
AFF 1-20-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
Honorable George Kelton
631357