judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0323
94-0323
04/08/1994
App Writ of Error
HORACE VIRGIL CRANK
THE HONORABLE MARK S. TOLLE JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/23/1994Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitionerattempted appeal of mandamus
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/13/1995Notice of Appeal from the U. S. Supreme CourtPET F/WRIT OF CERTIORARI DENIED 01/09/95 - #94-6918
11/28/1994Notice of Appeal from the U. S. Supreme CourtPET F/WRIT OF CERT FILED SEPTEMBER 12, 1994 - #94-6918
06/15/1994Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledMo for reconsideration of proceeding previously transferred to the Court of Criminal Appeals
05/23/1994Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
05/23/1994Motion for Rehearing
05/23/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord (what's left) in stored area
05/04/1994Application for Writ of Error - Disposedtransferred to Court of Criminal AppealsTRANSFERRED TO COURT OF CRIMINAL APPEALS
05/04/1994Case StoredTRANSFER TO CT/CRIMINAL APPEALS
05/04/1994Order of the Court IssuedORDER TRANSFERRING APP WRIT ERR TO CT/CRIMINAL APPEALS
04/28/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filedattempted appeal of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/04/1994Case StoredCase stored.mo/re filed 05-23-94
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Crank, Horace VirgilPetitionerHorace Virgil Crank
Court of Appeals Information:
05-94-00114-CV
Denied
___ SW2d ___, 01-26-94
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable SUE LAGARDE
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 3 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Mark S. Tolle
F84-89912-NJ