judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01801-CR
05-96-01801-CR
11/15/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Noble, Kevin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1998Mandate Issued
10/28/1998Mandate Issued
08/13/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/13/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1998Submitted
05/08/1998Submission
05/08/1998Submitted
04/20/1998Brief Filed
04/14/1998Submission
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
10/18/1997MattConv
09/18/1997Brief Filed
09/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/17/1997Brief Received
09/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/17/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
09/01/1997MattConv
08/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/01/1997MattConv
05/29/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/22/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
04/04/1997MattConv
03/05/1997Transcript Filed
02/21/1997Record due
02/18/1997Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/31/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/24/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/24/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/28/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasPatricia Poppoff Noble
Noble, KevinCriminal - AppellantHal E. Turley
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Bill C. Stephens
F96-01824-S
10 Yrs TDC