judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01815-CR
05-96-01815-CR
11/15/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Harrell, Richard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/05/2004Pulled from storage
08/05/2004Record Shipped
02/11/2003Mandate Issued
02/11/2003Mandate Issued
01/10/2003Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/16/2002Petition for discretionary review due
12/04/2002Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/18/2002Letter Received
10/30/2002File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals
10/28/2002Record Shipped
10/25/2002Motion to Obtain Record
10/22/2002Record RetentionRetain
10/16/2002Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
10/14/2002Petition for discretionary review due
10/08/2002Letter Sent by the Court
10/04/2002Motion to Obtain Record
09/20/2002Motion to File Disposed
09/20/2002Motion to Reconsider DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/18/2002Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/2002Mandate Issued
09/10/2002Motion to Appoint CounselMotion or Writ Denied
09/05/2002Motion to Appoint Counsel
09/04/2002Order EnteredDismissed
09/04/2002Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/2002Letter Filed
08/21/2002Opinion issuedDismissed
08/21/2002Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/2002Letter Sent by the Court
10/06/2000Return to storage
05/04/1999Mandate Issued
05/04/1999Mandate Issued
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1999Submitted
02/26/1999Submission
02/26/1999Submitted
02/25/1999Supplemental Reporter's Record Due
02/16/1999Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed
02/10/1999Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
02/02/1999Case ready to be set
02/02/1999Case ready to be set
01/25/1999Brief Filed
01/13/1999Submission
11/15/1998Brief Due
10/16/1998Brief Due
10/16/1998Brief Filed
09/01/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/27/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/11/1998Brief Due
06/22/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
06/22/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/10/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/15/1998Supplemental Reporter's Record Due
05/13/1998Supplemental Reporter's Record Filed
04/27/1998Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
03/26/1998Supplemental Record Due
02/24/1998Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/05/1998Motion to Supplement Record
02/04/1998Brief Due
01/05/1998Case reinstated
01/05/1998Case reinstated
12/19/1997Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed
10/01/1997Supplemental Record Due
09/18/1997Reporter's Record Filed
08/28/1997Order EnteredAbated
08/28/1997Order EnteredAbated
07/22/1997MattConv
07/14/1997MattConv
07/01/1997Supplemental Record Due
06/10/1997Case reinstated
06/10/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/10/1997Order EnteredVacated
06/10/1997Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
06/10/1997Case reinstated
05/30/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/22/1997Order EnteredAbated
05/22/1997Order EnteredAbated
04/02/1997MattConv
02/21/1997Transcript Filed
02/14/1997Record due
11/21/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/17/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/17/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/11/2003Case StoredCase stored
05/04/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mary BeltonCourt Reporter - Trial CourtMary Belton
Harrell, RichardCriminal - AppellantCelia M. Sams
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasErica H. Britt
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F95-48400-RH
99 Yrs/Fine 10,000