judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01811-CR
05-96-01811-CR
11/15/1996
Felony DWI
Stone, Jeffery Steven
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/28/1999Reporter's Record Filed
12/17/1998Mandate Issued
12/17/1998Mandate Issued
11/17/1998Record Returned
10/21/1998Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
09/28/1998Withdraw Mandate
09/24/1998Mandate Issued
08/21/1998File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals
08/17/1998Record Shipped
07/03/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/03/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1998Submitted
05/08/1998Submission
05/08/1998Submitted
04/27/1998Brief Filed
04/14/1998Submission
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
10/26/1997MattConv
10/21/1997Letter Received
10/08/1997Amended Brief Filed
09/29/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/26/1997Brief Filed
09/26/1997MattConv
09/26/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/17/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
08/07/1997MattConv
06/08/1997MattConv
06/05/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
05/09/1997Transcript Filed
04/24/1997MattConv
04/01/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
03/31/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
02/04/1997Record due
01/14/1997Letter Filed
01/06/1997Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/06/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/07/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/17/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Stone, Jeffery StevenCriminal - AppellantLawrence B. Mitchell
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWendy Koster
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F92-60968-J
5 Yrs Pen