judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01806-CR
05-96-01806-CR
11/15/1996
Other Felony
Waters, Benny Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/1998Mandate Issued
10/01/1998Mandate Issued
07/20/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/20/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/12/1998Submitted
06/12/1998Submission
06/12/1998Submitted
05/21/1998Submission
09/16/1997MattConv
09/15/1997Brief Filed
09/15/1997Case ready to be set
09/15/1997Case ready to be set
05/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/17/1997MattConv
04/23/1997MattConv
04/22/1997Brief Filed
04/02/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/24/1997Statement of Facts Filed
03/07/1997Transcript Filed
02/27/1997Record due
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/04/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/30/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/30/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/01/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Waters, Benny LeeCriminal - AppellantDouglas H. Parks
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWendy Koster
Sue Korioth
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
F96-47053-J
12 Yrs Pen