judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01809-CR
05-96-01809-CR
11/15/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Gamez, Steve
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1999Letter Sent by the Court
10/01/1999Letter Received
11/12/1998Mandate Issued
11/12/1998Mandate Issued
08/26/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
08/26/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
08/26/1998Opinion issuedDismissed
07/31/1998Submission
04/09/1998Letter Sent by the Court
04/08/1998Letter Received
01/12/1998Brief Filed
01/10/1998Brief Due
01/09/1998Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed
12/29/1997Letter Filed
12/11/1997Motion to Dissolve DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/13/1997Case ready to be set
10/13/1997Case ready to be set
10/12/1997MattConv
10/09/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal
09/12/1997Brief Filed
09/12/1997MattConv
08/13/1997Case reinstated
08/13/1997Order Entered
08/13/1997Case reinstated
08/07/1997Supplemental Record Due
08/04/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
08/01/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
06/30/1997Order EnteredAbated
05/27/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
05/15/1997MattConv
04/15/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/24/1997MattConv
02/11/1997Transcript Filed
01/31/1997Record due
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/01/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
11/01/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/03/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/12/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasKatherine Witt Spradlin
Gamez, SteveCriminal - AppellantLinda Guadarrama
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F95-53641-J
20 Yrs Pen