judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01791-CR
05-96-01791-CR
11/15/1996
Robbery
Nelson, Carla
The State of Texas
No
7th Court of Appeals
05/19/1997
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/19/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/1997Motion to Compel
01/28/1997MattConv
12/11/1996Record due
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/10/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
08/13/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/19/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Nelson, CarlaCriminal - AppellantEtta Mullin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F96-33617
Revocation 15 Yrs Pen