judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1264-89
PD-1264-89
09/15/1989
PDR Case Type
O''RARDEN, PATRICK LAWRENCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/13/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/05/1990FINAL DISPRefused
01/05/1990FINAL DISPRefused
12/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
12/20/1989PDR DISPRefused
11/30/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
10/30/1989PDR FILED
10/17/1989EXT FILE PDR DISPGranted
10/17/1989EXT FILE PDR FILED
10/13/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/15/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O''RARDEN, PATRICK LAWRENCEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jeff L. Pierce
STATE OF TEXASStateGeorge Roland
John Roach
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00513-CR
Rev & Rem 8-29-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
219th District Court
Collin
Honorable Tom Ryan
219-10177-87