judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1265-89
PD-1265-89
09/15/1989
PDR Case Type
LEMUS, HERMINIO, PRIN. & ALLIED BONDING COMPANY, SURETY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/08/1990BRIEF FILEDState
11/30/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
09/15/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/22/1991MANDATE ISSD
02/06/1991REHEAR DISPDENIED
01/24/1991REHEAR FILED
01/24/1991REHEAR RECEIVED
01/03/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
01/02/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
12/19/1990OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
03/07/1990SUBMITTED
01/08/1990BRIEF FILED
01/02/1990NO BRIEF FILED
12/19/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
11/30/1989BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
11/22/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
10/25/1989PDR DISPGranted
09/15/1989PDR FILED
09/15/1989RESPONSE FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/22/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
LEMUS, HERMINIOPRIN. & ALLIEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)RANDY ADLER
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01404-CV
Aff 6-7-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 4 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Frances Maloney
F87-99913-VHK