judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01813-CR
05-96-01813-CR
11/15/1996
Robbery
Adams, Christopher Tyrone
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/2006Letter Sent by the Court
09/27/2006Letter Received
07/20/1999Mandate Issued
07/20/1999Mandate Issued
05/07/1999Petition for discretionary review due
03/02/1999Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1999Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
02/05/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/05/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/06/1999Submitted
01/06/1999Submission
01/06/1999Submitted
11/12/1998Brief Filed
11/10/1998Letter Sent by the Court
11/09/1998Submission
10/26/1998Letter Received
05/07/1998Case ready to be set
05/07/1998Case ready to be set
04/15/1998Brief Due
03/16/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/13/1998Brief Filed
03/13/1998Brief Received
03/13/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/05/1998Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
02/26/1998Brief Due
12/19/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/08/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
11/28/1997MattConv
10/03/1997Letter Sent by the Court
10/02/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/26/1997Letter Received
09/26/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/19/1997Supplemental Transcript Due
09/17/1997Notice To Appellant that Brief is late
09/17/1997Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed
08/29/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1997Order EnteredOtherwise Disposed
08/13/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney
07/30/1997MattConv
07/24/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/23/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/12/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/08/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/30/1997MattConv
03/31/1997Clerk's Record Filed
03/31/1997Statement of Facts Filed
03/29/1997MattConv
03/19/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/27/1997Record due
02/06/1997Letter Sent by the Court
12/30/1996Letter Received
11/21/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/04/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
11/04/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/30/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/20/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael J. Sandlin
Adams, Christopher TyroneCriminal - Appellant
Christopher Tyrone, AdamsCriminal - AppellantLawrence B. Mitchell
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F96-43666-R
Life