judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DC DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS V. DC PUBLIC EMPLOYEE RELATIONS BRD

Case Information: 10-CV-1482
Short Caption:DC DEP'T OF CORRECTIONS V. DC PUBLIC EMPLOYEE RELATIONS BRDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB397-08Filed Date:11/19/2010

Opening Event Date:11/19/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/27/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantD.C. Department of CorrectionsN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonNY
James T. Langford NN
AppelleeD.C. Public Employee Relations BoardN
Bruce A. Fredrickson NN
AppelleeFop/dept of Corrections Labor CommitteeN
J. Michael HannonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 19, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/27/2010RECORD INDEX
12/27/2010RECORD COPIES
12/27/2010RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
03/09/2011DISMISSED
03/23/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for an extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees to March 30, 2011.
05/06/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time to file motion for attorney fees until March 30, 2011, and it appearing that no motion for attorney fees has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee's motion is denied as moot. (ETW) elp
11/14/2011FiledMandate