judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER DUANE GREENE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0014)
Case Number:S-09-0014Case Docketed On:01/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER DUANE GREENE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER DUANE GREENE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher Duane GreeneDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 99
Citation:214 P.3d 222

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/04/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/13/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/04/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, nine volumes. (Case No. 08-42: Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File; Case No. 08-122: Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File; Case 08-150: Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/18/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/08/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/4/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal