judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1285
B-1285
01/03/1969
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
ERNEST RECH, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/12/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/05/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/16/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/03/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1969Reply to Response
03/10/1969Response to Motion filed
03/05/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1969Response to Petition
01/03/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/03/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ernest Rech, et ux.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information