judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01796-CR
05-96-01796-CR
11/15/1996
Capital Murder
Jojola, Juan E.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/19/1999Mandate Issued
01/19/1999Mandate Issued
12/02/1998Record Returned
11/25/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/19/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/30/1998petition for review disposedRefused
07/23/1998File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals
07/21/1998Record Shipped
07/14/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/29/1998Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
06/29/1998Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
05/06/1998Submitted
05/06/1998Submission
05/06/1998Submitted
04/27/1998Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/24/1998Motion for Postponement
03/23/1998Letter Filed
03/17/1998Letter Filed
03/09/1998Submission
12/03/1997Brief Filed
09/11/1997Case ready to be set
09/11/1997Case ready to be set
09/08/1997MattConv
05/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/27/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/26/1997MattConv
05/01/1997Brief Filed
05/01/1997MattConv
04/22/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/14/1997Motion to Substitute Attorney
03/02/1997MattConv
01/31/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/16/1997MattConv
01/07/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/02/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/17/1996Record due
12/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/20/1996Notice Sent
11/15/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
10/18/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jojola, Juan E.Criminal - AppellantRandy Taylor
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn R. Rolater, Jr.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F96-02998-R
50 Yrs Pen