judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1266-89
PD-1266-89
09/15/1989
PDR Case Type
FELDER, NATHAN J.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/15/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Felder, NathanApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)David M. Green
STATE OF TEXASStateBarry Blackwell
Court of Appeals Information:
07-89-00093-CR
Aff 8-9-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
69th District Court
Dallam
Honorable Bill Sheehan
2959