judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9058
C-9058
09/15/1989
App Writ of Error
GEORGE and ADELINE POPE
CHARLES WILLIAM STEPHENSON and MOORE TRANSPORTATION CO. INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/23/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
05/10/1990Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/17/1989Reply BriefRespondentBRIEF OF RESPONDENTS IN OPPOSITION TO SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
09/28/1989Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/15/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED 787 SW2D 953
05/30/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
05/23/1990Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
05/16/1990Notice requesting filing fee
05/10/1990Motion for Rehearing
05/10/1990Motion for Rehearing forwardedRECORD REMAINS IN CLERK'S OFFICE
04/25/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied with per curiamAS SUPP. PER CURIAM OPINION
04/25/1990Opinion issuedDeniedPER CURIAM OPINION 787 SW2D 953
11/17/1989Reply BriefBRIEF OF RESPONDENTS IN OPPOSITION TO SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
10/24/1989Supplement or amendment to application.
10/05/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/05/1989No description available.
09/28/1989Reply to Response
09/15/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/31/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00127-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___SW2d___, 07-05-89
8th Court of Appeals
Honorable JERRY WOODARD
Trial Court Information
193rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable John H. Whittington
85-9635-L