judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1268-89
PD-1268-89
09/15/1989
PDR Case Type
DANZIGER, EX PARTE RICHARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/19/1990BRIEF FILEDState
11/15/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/13/1990MANDATE ISSD
03/28/1990OPINION ISSDDismissed
03/12/1990MISC DOCUMENT RECD
02/28/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
01/19/1990BRIEF FILED
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
01/15/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
12/18/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
12/15/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/15/1989BRIEF FILED
11/15/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
11/14/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
11/03/1989NO BRIEF FILED
10/04/1989PDR DISPGranted
09/15/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
DANZIGER, EX PARTE RICHARDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Berkley Bettis
Walter C. Prentice
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00038-CR
Aff 8-9-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
299th District Court
Travis
Honorable JON N. WISSER
94,518