judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRUDENTIAL PROPERTY VS. THE 2ND JUD DIST CT

Case Information: 33474
Short Caption:PRUDENTIAL PROPERTY VS. THE 2ND JUD DIST CTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9702954Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/16/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/16/1998Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. 98-00397
12/18/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing Prudential's Emergency Petition for Writ of mandamus and Emergency Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. 98-00446
12/22/1998Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: " . . . we deny the petition and the motion for a stay." 98-00482
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/12/1999RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 99-00163