judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SLADE VS. NEUENS

Case Information: 38271
Short Caption:SLADE VS. NEUENSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 01CV0024Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:GibbonsCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Agosti for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/14/2001 / Manoukian, NoelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/12/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Brooke Shaw Plimpton Zumpft--check no. 18871.
08/03/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13148
08/14/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Noel Manoukian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/21/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14182
08/23/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Noel Manoukian.
11/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-19889
12/19/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21387
12/28/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/25/01, 4/26/01. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 01-21840
01/08/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request. Transcripts requested: 2/22/01. To Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 02-00477
02/01/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/25/01, 4/26/01. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 02-02172
03/06/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/22/01. Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 02-04109
04/18/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 4/18/02. Signed by Michael L. Matuska. 02-06965
04/18/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 02-06966
05/22/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/21/02. 02-09009
05/22/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-09011
06/24/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 06/24/02. 02-10911
06/27/2002Other Other. Received Table of Contents and Table of Authorities to Appellant's Reply Brief filed on 06/24/02. Attached to inside front cover of Original and copies of Reply Brief.
12/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-21293
12/12/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03-DA/RR/WM
01/06/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Gibbons.
04/18/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03-DA/RR/WM 03-06637
05/13/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06772
05/13/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/19/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2003. 03-06772