judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN L. FERGUSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1454
Short Caption:MELVIN L. FERGUSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL2502-04Filed Date:11/19/2010

Opening Event Date:11/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin L. Ferguson Y
Cory Lee CarlyleYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal, and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that Corylee Carlyle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11(b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
12/07/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Corylee Carlyle, Esquire
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Costillo)
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix attached
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/22/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days. no oppo
03/30/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 21, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/29/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/11/2011FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Reid,Nebeker
11/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
11/28/2011FiledMandate
12/02/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)