judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1313
B-1313
01/13/1969
Application for Writ of Error
WALTER WINFORD DILLINGHAM
ZEXIA PARMER DILLINGHAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/07/1969Errata FiledPetitioner
01/27/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/25/1969Response to Motion filed
03/20/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/07/1969Errata Filed
01/27/1969Response to Petition
01/27/1969Motion to dismiss
01/13/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/13/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walter Winford DillinghamPetitioner
Zexia Parmer DillinghamRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information