judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALISON KEARNEY V. AL JAZEERA INTERNATIONAL USA

Case Information: 10-AA-1444
Short Caption:ALISON KEARNEY V. AL JAZEERA INTERNATIONAL USAClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01909-10Filed Date:12/02/2010

Opening Event Date:12/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAlison Kearney NPro SeN
RespondentAl Jazeera International UsaNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/02/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW-NUNC PRO TUNC ****SEE 12/6/10 ORDER LW
12/02/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/06/2010 On consideration of the LODGED PFR RECEIVED on November 19, 2010 taken from a Final Order entered on September 29, 2010, and it appearing that the $100 filing fee was not tendered until December 2, 2010. It is ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall file the lodged PFR, NPT to December 2, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
12/06/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL w/n 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this petition should ot be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 15 (a);... (BY: ETW)
12/06/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
12/22/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (no certificate of service)
12/23/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to Amend Response to Order to Show Cause. ******CONSTRUED AS A SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ******SEE 1/11/11 ORDER LW
01/11/2011 ORDERED that even if the court were to construe the petition as filed on 11/19/10, see DC App. R. 15 (a0(4)(filing of PFR is actual receipt by this court), the petition is still UNTIMELY FILED and therefore DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 15(a)(2);... (BRTEFA) (rl)
01/11/2011DISMISSED
02/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED