judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00297-CV
13-89-00297-CV
08/07/1989
Personal Injuries/Damages
Briseno, Doroteo Lopez and Elva Alicia Briseno
Texas Lumber Company, David Lee Spruill, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/1990Mandate Issued
06/19/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/11/1990Submitted
01/11/1990Submission
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/10/1990Oral argument requested
01/10/1990Brief Filed
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1989Submission
12/04/1989Oral argument requested
12/04/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/21/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/15/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/15/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/15/1989Exhibits Filed
08/11/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/07/1989Transcript Filed
08/07/1989Transcript Received
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/17/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
135th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Marion M Lewis
88-1-37,808B