judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-70,893
AP-70,893
08/08/1989
Appeal Case Type
MINES, CHARLES E. JR. AKA CHARLES ANDERSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/14/1993BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/13/1993BRIEF FILEDState
09/14/1990BRIEF FILEDState
07/23/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/08/1997REQ PREPYMT DISPDENIED
04/04/1997REQ PREPYMT RECD
03/25/1997MOTION DISPGranted
03/10/1997MOTION FILED
12/11/1996REQ PREPYMT MADE
11/27/1996REQ PREPYMT DISPGranted
11/18/1996REQ PREPYMT RECD
10/23/1996ORDER FILED
10/08/1996APPT COUNSEL/ORDERGranted
05/07/1996TC NOTICE RECEIVED
05/22/1995WRIT OF CERT USSCDENIED
03/23/1995WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
03/10/1995STAY OF EXECUTION
02/24/1995STAY OF EXECUTIONDENIED
02/24/1995STAY OF EXECUTIONDENIED
01/30/1995EXECUTION DATE SET
12/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
12/16/1994MANDATE ISSD
11/30/1994OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/30/1994OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/30/1994OPINION ISSDAffirmed
11/30/1994OPINION ISSDAffirmed
12/15/1993Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
12/15/1993SUBMITTED
12/14/1993BRIEF FILED
12/14/1993MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTDENIED
12/14/1993MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTDENIED
12/13/1993BRIEF FILED
11/09/1993Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
11/09/1993REINSTATED DP
11/09/1993REINSTATED
11/09/1993SET FOR SUBMIS
10/06/1993WRIT OF CERT USSCGranted
06/24/1993WRIT OF CERT USSCFiled
06/04/1993Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
06/04/1993MANDATE ISSD
03/31/1993STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
03/31/1993STAY MANDAT MOT TOGranted
03/17/1993REHEAR DISPDENIED
03/17/1993REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/22/1992REPLY TO REHEAR
11/30/1992REHEAR FILED DP
11/30/1992REHEAR FILED
10/30/1992REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
10/30/1992REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
10/14/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
10/14/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
10/14/1992OPINION ISSDAffirmed
10/31/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
10/31/1990SUBMITTED
09/17/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
09/17/1990SET FOR SUBMIS DP
09/14/1990BRIEF FILED
08/17/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
08/17/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
07/23/1990BRIEF FILED
06/20/1990EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
06/20/1990EXT BRIEF FILED
05/25/1990SF FILED DP
05/03/1990EXT SF DISPGranted
05/03/1990EXT SF FILED
03/05/1990EXT SF DISPGranted
03/05/1990EXT SF FILED
01/02/1990EXT SF DISPGranted
01/02/1990EXT SF FILED
08/08/1989DP BEGIN
08/08/1989DP BEGIN
08/08/1989EXT SF DISPGranted
08/08/1989EXT SF FILED
08/08/1989TRANSCRIPT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/16/1994STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MINES, CHARLES E. JR. AKA CHARApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)James R. Jenkins
STATE OF TEXASStateJoe F. Grubbs
Dan Morales
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
Honorable GENE KNIZE
16,691