judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00745-CR
14-89-00745-CR
08/08/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Derouselle, Robert Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Case stored
01/07/1991Mandate Issued
01/07/1991Mandate Issued
12/21/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/06/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/24/1990Submitted
10/24/1990Submission
10/24/1990Submitted
09/27/1990Submission
08/02/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/02/1990Case ready to be set
08/02/1990Case ready to be set
07/05/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/05/1990Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STAGRANTED
06/26/1990Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
06/26/1990Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
06/07/1990Motion to reconsider DISPOSED - ANT, APE, APP, STADENIED
06/07/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
05/25/1990Motion to reconsider FILED - ANT, APE, APP, STA
05/10/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
05/01/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/23/1990No description available.
03/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/13/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/06/1990No description available.
01/18/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/08/1990No description available.
12/07/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/28/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/21/1989No description available.
10/19/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/19/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/11/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/11/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
10/05/1989No description available.
10/03/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/04/1989Date of Sentence
08/04/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Rowena M. Young
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantConnie Brown Williams
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
486,289
60 yrs. TDC& $2500 fine