judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00376-CV
04-89-00376-CV
08/07/1989
Summary Judgment
Mrs. Norris N. Frizzell
M.E. 'Doc' Cook; Harvie D. Lindeman; Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/25/1991Mandate Issued
01/25/1991Mandate Issued
01/17/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
01/09/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/24/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
07/19/1990Information regarding cause received
07/03/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/29/1990Writ of Error filed
06/01/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/03/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/18/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/18/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/03/1990Submitted
01/03/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/03/1990Submission
01/03/1990Submitted
12/27/1989Reply brief filed
11/27/1989Submission
09/29/1989Brief Filed
09/29/1989Case ready to be set
09/29/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/29/1989Case ready to be set
09/06/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/06/1989Brief Filed
08/07/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/05/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/07/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/25/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
225th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Michael P Peden
88-CI-08905
n/a