judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00940-CV
05-89-00940-CV
08/07/1989
Contract
Josef Speed
Pedro Delgado Torres
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/20/2000Record RetentionDestroy
01/11/1990Mandate Issued
01/11/1990Mandate Issued
11/02/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
11/02/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
10/19/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/10/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/12/1989MattConv
09/08/1989Motion - Ext to File Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/28/1989Transcript Filed
08/28/1989Transcript Tendered
08/08/1989MattConv
08/07/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/07/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
86-247-C