judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00949-CV
05-89-00949-CV
08/07/1989
Contract
Table Charm, Ltd.
Charles R. Smith
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
04/12/1990Mandate Issued
04/12/1990Mandate Issued
02/28/1990Submission
02/09/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
02/09/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
02/07/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/07/1990Submission
02/07/1990Submitted
12/21/1989MattConv
10/17/1989Motion to Advance Case DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/13/1989Brief Filed
10/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/13/1989Motion to Advance Case Filed
10/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/12/1989Letter Filed
09/20/1989Brief Filed
08/21/1989MattConv
08/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/07/1989Transcript Filed
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/24/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
162nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Catherine J. Crier
89-576-I