judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00259-CV
07-89-00259-CV
08/07/1989
Miscellaneous civil
McBeth, Bobby D. and Delina Beth McBeth
Ebeling, Ernest C., Jr. and Marvin F. Holland
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/30/1990Mandate Issued
12/13/1989Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
12/13/1989Submitted
12/13/1989Submission
11/21/1989Letter of Inquiry filed
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
10/09/1989Brief Filed
10/09/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/06/1989Brief Filed
08/07/1989Do not use
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/31/1989Motion - Ext to File Bond DispGRANT
07/31/1989Response to any order, inquiry or motion
07/24/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/30/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
242nd District Court
Hale
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
88-11-B24425