judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00807-CR
01-89-00807-CR
08/07/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Williams, Leon
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/06/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
02/28/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
01/31/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/10/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/20/1990Submitted
11/20/1990Submission
11/20/1990Submitted
10/05/1990Submission
07/16/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/16/1990Case ready to be set
07/16/1990Case ready to be set
06/20/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
05/31/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/18/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/30/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/05/1990Statement of facts filed
02/08/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispMotion will be taken with case
01/26/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/26/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/26/1989Transcript filed
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/28/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantFloyd W. Freed III
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
530,452
25 yrs tdc