judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00196-CV
12-89-00196-CV
08/07/1989
Contract
Barker, Ron
Lynn Swanner, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/20/1989ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
10/17/1989Mandate Issued
10/02/1989
09/15/1989
08/31/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/31/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
08/31/1989Case ready to be set
08/31/1989Submission
08/31/1989Submitted
08/25/1989Response to Motion Filed
08/10/1989Letter from the Court
08/07/1989No Description Available.
08/07/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/08/1989Surety Bond Filed
05/10/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Honorable Larry W Starr
131-89