judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8941
C-8941
08/07/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
DONALD H. PEREZ M.D.
THE HONORABLE PETER MICHAEL CURRY JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/27/1989Motion for RehearingRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/18/1990Case StoredREHEARING OVERRULED
01/18/1990Case StoredREHEARING OVERRULED
01/17/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
12/27/1989Motion for Rehearing
12/04/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedW/NOTATION: 'NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS'
12/01/1989Exhibits received1 MANILA ENVELOPE
11/30/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingRELATOR'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTEN- SION OF TIME TO FILE REHEARING, ORIGINAL & 1 FORWARDED
11/17/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling granted
09/29/1989Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing
09/13/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
08/07/1989Exhibits received
08/07/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/07/1989No description available.
08/07/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/18/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MILLER, SAM (MD)RespondentMs. Cynthia Day Grimes
RODRIGUEZ, CARMEN M.RespondentMr. Dennis P. Bujnoch
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00349-CV
Denied
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
166th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
87C-12253