judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00314-CV
02-96-00314-CV
11/14/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Stewart, Theodore Lee, Individually and as Community Survivor & Heir at Law of the Estate of Pamela Sue Stewart, Deceased
Hardie, M.D., Robert P.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/15/1999Mandate Issued
02/25/1999Petition for Review Filed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
12/01/1998Other Document Received
11/24/1998Higher Court Decision
09/18/1998Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
08/06/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/06/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/27/1998Response Filed
06/26/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/11/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1997Submitted
06/11/1997Submission
04/30/1997No Description Available.
04/24/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/04/1997Case ready to be set
04/04/1997Brief Filed
04/02/1997Motion Filed
02/03/1997Brief Filed
12/04/1996No Description Available.
11/27/1996Submission
11/26/1996Letter
11/22/1996Exhibits Filed
11/22/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hardie, M.D., Robert P.AppelleeD. Michael Wallach
Stewart, Theodore Lee IndividAppellantOlan John Boudreaux
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Fred W. Davis
17-138851-91