judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-96-00435-CR
08-96-00435-CR
11/14/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
The State of Texas
Villalobos, Jaime
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/1998Mandate Issued
05/11/1998Shuck purged
05/11/1998Mandate Issued
12/04/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/04/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/10/1997Submitted
09/10/1997Submission
09/10/1997Submitted
07/29/1997Submission
05/22/1997Brief Filed
05/22/1997Case ready to be set
05/22/1997Case ready to be set
05/09/1997Supplemental Transcript Filed
05/07/1997Brief Filed
05/07/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/1997Motion to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/25/1997Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
04/25/1997Motion to supplement filed
04/23/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/24/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/24/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/05/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/29/1997Fee paid
01/22/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/23/1996Payment of fee due requested
12/23/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/23/1996Transcript Filed
11/14/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASAppellantHon. Jaime E. Esparza
VILLALOBOS, JAIMEAppelleeThe Honorable Luis Aguilar
Trial Court Information
384th District Court
El Paso
960D07521