judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-96-00253-CV
10-96-00253-CV
11/14/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Paul Clarke
Alfred Lehtonen
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/13/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/06/2004Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk.
09/21/1998Case stored
09/21/1998Mandate issued by this Court
07/01/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1997Submitted
11/19/1997Submission
10/27/1997Submission
10/06/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
10/06/1997Case ready to be set
09/15/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/10/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
08/21/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
07/16/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
07/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
06/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/09/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
05/27/1997No Description Available.
03/12/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/25/1997No Description Available.
01/02/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/17/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/13/2005Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lehtonen, AlfredAppelleeJon E. Miller
W. Stephen Rodgers
Clarke, PaulAppellantWilliam Steven Steele
Fred Davis
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable Carolyn L. Ruffino
31,301-361