judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00337-CV
12-96-00337-CV
11/14/1996
Mandamus
Shaklee, Richard D.
Sage, Hon. Robin
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
01/02/1997Letter from the Court
12/31/1996Higher Court Decision
11/25/1996Supplemental Transcript Received
11/19/1996Disposition of MotionOverruled
11/19/1996Order EnteredOverruled
11/18/1996motion filed
11/18/1996affidavit received
11/14/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996No Description Available.
11/14/1996petition for writ of mandamus received
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/2012Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sage, RobinRespondentJudge Robin Dale Sage
Shaklee, Mary J.Real party in interestMs. Patricia Ray
Shaklee, Richard D.RelatorMr. Robert R. Foster
Trial Court Information
307th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Cynthia S. Kent
93-508-DR