judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-96-00396-CV
07-96-00396-CV
11/14/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Shultz, William B., Sr. Family Living Q-Tip Trust
Franklin Credit Management Corporation formerly know as Miramar Resources, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/1997Mandate Issued
06/17/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/17/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/04/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/29/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/19/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/11/1997Submitted
03/11/1997Submission
02/14/1997Submission
01/31/1997Brief Filed
01/31/1997Case ready to be set
12/30/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/23/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/12/1996Brief Filed
12/10/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispGRANT
11/25/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/14/1996Do not use
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/08/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Franklin Credit Management CorAppelleeRobert R. Bell
Don D. Sunderland
Shultz, Sr., William B.AppellantSelden B. Hale
Trial Court Information
69th District Court
Hartley
Honorable Ron Enns
3652-H