judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00637-CR
03-96-00637-CR
11/14/1996
DWI
Harvey Galan Fierro
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
08/14/1998Correction filed
07/27/1998Mandate Acknowledgment
07/08/1998Mandate Issued
04/09/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/20/1998Supplemental Record Filed
03/11/1998Submitted
03/11/1998Submission
02/11/1998Oral argument acknowledged
01/29/1998Submission
08/18/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
08/08/1997Brief filed
08/08/1997Case ready to be set
08/08/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/1997Brief received, not filed
08/04/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/04/1997Leave to supplement disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Brief filed
07/09/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/1997Brief received, not filed
07/03/1997Leave to supplement filed
07/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/05/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/21/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/18/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/21/1997Ext. to file s/facts filed and disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
12/12/1996Supplemental Transcript filed
12/06/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/14/1996Transcript & SF Filed
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/08/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ken Oden
Ms. Giselle Horton
Fierro, Harvey GalanAppellantMr. Richard Segura Jr.
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 5
Travis
Honorable Wilfred R. Aguilar
412,435
90 days/$1000 (PROBATED)