judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01392-CR
01-96-01392-CR
11/14/1996
Assault & battery
Johnson, Rodney Dean
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/10/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/10/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/14/2000Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
01/12/2000Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/23/1999Motion for rehearing filed
11/10/1999Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
09/10/1999Case file received by higher Court or agency.
09/09/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/27/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/13/1999Motion for Rehearing Due
07/29/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/29/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1998Correspondence
11/17/1998Submitted
11/17/1998Submission
11/17/1998Submitted
11/16/1998Correspondence
10/08/1998Submission
12/11/1997Motion was disposedGrant motion
12/11/1997Supplemental brief filed
12/03/1997Motion filed
11/26/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/26/1997Case ready to be set
11/26/1997Case ready to be set
10/15/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/29/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/05/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/01/1997Brief Due
08/25/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/20/1997Correspondence
08/10/1997Brief Due
08/07/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/26/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/19/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
06/19/1997Statement of facts filed
06/13/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/03/1997Motion to extend time to file Supp. SFACTS
03/27/1997Motion to ext. time to file ssfacts dispGrant motion
03/27/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/27/1997No description available.
03/18/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/18/1997Motion to extend time to file Supp. SFACTS
03/18/1997Supplemental Statement of facts Received
03/06/1997Record due
02/28/1997Statement of facts filed
02/18/1997Transcript filed
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/13/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
11/08/1996Notice of appeal filed
11/06/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasDavid P. Bosserman
Jerome Aldrich
JOHNSON, RODNEY DEANCriminal - AppellantLeonel Torres
Lawrence S. Rothenberg
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
Honorable OGDEN L. BASS
29397
10 Yrs. TDC