judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01361-CV
01-96-01361-CV
11/14/1996
Divorce
Burkhart, Kimberly Ann
Burkhart, Keith A.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/24/1998Date Petition for Review returned from Supreme Ct
07/03/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/13/1998Date final opinion release for publication
03/05/1998Date Petition for Review filed in Supeme Court
01/27/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/27/1998Order enteredGrant motion
01/27/1998Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/23/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
01/23/1998Motion filed
01/23/1998Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/20/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/20/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
12/17/1997Motion for rehearing filed
12/17/1997Motion for rehearing filed
12/15/1997Correspondence
12/11/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
12/11/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
11/17/1997Submitted
11/17/1997Submission
11/17/1997Submitted
10/06/1997Submission
05/07/1997Brief Due
04/30/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/30/1997Case ready to be set
04/17/1997Brief Due
04/17/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/07/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/06/1997Brief Due
03/27/1997Motion to supplement record disposedGrant motion
03/27/1997No description available.
03/27/1997Supplemental transcript filed
03/12/1997Brief Due
03/12/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/12/1997Motion to supplement record
03/12/1997Supplemental Statement of facts Received
03/10/1997Supplemental Transcript Received
02/10/1997Statement of Facts Due
02/10/1997Statement of facts filed
12/12/1996Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/02/1996Motion to ext. time to file bond disposedGrant motion
12/02/1996No description available.
12/02/1996Transcript filed
11/27/1996Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/20/1996Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
11/15/1996Record due
11/14/1996Transcript Received
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/29/1996Motion to extend time to file bond
10/28/1996Appeal bond filed
08/21/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
07/18/1996Date judgment signed by trial judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BURKHART, KEITH A.AppelleeDeborah January-Bevers
BURKHART, KIMBERLY ANNAppellantD. Channing Bradshaw
Trial Court Information
306th District Court
Galveston
Honorable SUSAN BAKER
94FD2161