judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1120
96-1120
11/14/1996
App Writ of Error
LYNDA J. SANDERLIN
JOHN SANDERLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/26/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
03/12/1997Motion for RehearingPetitionerenvelope attached
11/14/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/08/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
03/27/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledrehearing overruled
03/26/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
03/12/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/12/1997Motion for Rehearingenvelope attached
03/12/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
02/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
12/04/1996Case forwarded to Court
11/14/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/08/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F3 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SANDERLIN, LYNDA J.PetitionerHonorable Robert Garza
SANDERLIN, JOHNRespondentMr. Nathan East
Court of Appeals Information:
04-95-00600-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
929 SW2d 121, 08-30-96
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable PHIL HARDBERGER
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Val Verde
Honorable James M. Simmonds
135