judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HARRIET BROWN V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1485
Short Caption:HARRIET BROWN V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB165-10Filed Date:12/01/2010

Opening Event Date:12/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorUnited Medical CenterN
Sara A. Corle NN
Raphael J. Cohen NN
IntervenorChartis Insurance CompanyN
Sara A. Corle YN
PetitionerHarriet Brown N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/01/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/01/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/01/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. & Gregory Lamb, Esq.
12/17/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
01/13/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE to file notice of intent (United Medical Center and Chartis Insurance Company) unopposed
01/13/2011RECEIVED- notice of intention to intervene
01/20/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall file the lodged notice of intent to intervene and enter the appearances of the United Meidcal Center and Chartis Insurance Company as intervenors in this matter. It is F/O that intervenor's brief shall be filed 30 days after petitioner's brief is filed with this court. (ETW)
01/20/2011NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE United Medical Center and Chartis Insurance Company
01/31/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
01/31/2011APPENDIX
02/28/2011INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/11/11
03/02/2011RECEIVED- supplemental appendix of intervenor
03/03/2011 On consideration of the motion of intervenor for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of intervenor is granted and the brief of intervenor shall be filed on or before March 11, 2011. (JAC)
03/07/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (D.C.)
03/11/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
03/11/2011INTERVENOR'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix no ppo
03/21/2011ORDER GRANT INTV MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION and the lodged supplemental appendix is filed. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
03/21/2011APPENDIX (Supplemental)
03/21/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
05/03/2011RECEIVED- preaecipe substituting appearance (sent back for a motion)
05/10/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - for substitution of counsel Raphael J. Cohen will replace Sara A. Corle on behalf of the intervenor (dwm) (Titled: motion to substitute appearance)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/13/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Thompson, Pryor
10/28/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
11/22/2011FiledMandate