Case Information: 33478 | |||
Short Caption: | BURKETT VS. MORAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A362801 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Becker | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/22/1998 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/17/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/17/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00403 | |
12/17/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/17/1998 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/22/1998 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/04/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
01/04/1999 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (Handwritten). | 99-00008 | |
01/05/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael V. Stuhff--check no. 5262. | ||
01/19/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Procedural Order Pursuant to NRAP 27. | 99-00379 | |
01/19/1999 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. | 99-00008 | |
01/21/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Document: Docketing Statement. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on January 19, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. | 99-00421 | |
01/21/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-00008 | |
01/25/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of this order, file a case appeal statement in the district court and file, with this court, two certified copies of the case appeal statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. | 99-00468 | |
01/26/1999 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. Mailed on: 1/25/99. | 99-00534 | |
01/26/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. All parties agree to pay their own costs. Mailed on: 1/25/99. | 99-00535 | |
02/09/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." We hereby vacate our order of January 25, 1999, directing appellant to file the case appeal statement. NRAP 42(b). NNP | 99-00885 |