judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-96-00106-CR
06-96-00106-CR
11/14/1996
OTHER CRIMINAL
Gornick, Brian
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1997Mandate Issued
06/11/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/22/1997Submitted
05/22/1997Submission
05/06/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/06/1997MOTION FOR POSTPONEMENT
05/06/1997Submission
04/29/1997Submission
04/18/1997Brief Filed
04/18/1997Case ready to be set
03/28/1997Brief Filed
03/28/1997Request for Oral Argument
03/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/29/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/06/1997Received a Response
12/18/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/21/1996Transcript Filed
11/14/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/14/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brian GornickAppellantHon. Danny Woodson
Gary L. Waite
Trial Court Information
County Court
Franklin
07243
90 days;Probated 90 days